+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Failed to pass
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 8, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan Floor amendment, reference to the Commerce Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
2087ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2009: Commerce and Economic Development: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 17, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
January 15, 2009: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1