+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HB 2085 substituted for SB 1095. Motion carried.: PASSED
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
January 14, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8