+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 93
- Action: Signed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Kavanagh flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Senate first read
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 21, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 21, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1