+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 22, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 16, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 12, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 12, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor