+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 9, 2018: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 9, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor