+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: WM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to WM - McComish
- Final disposition: Substituted Senate bill on third reading
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
McComish Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McComish Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 15, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2