+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 32
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:30 pm
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
6-12 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 8, 2009: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 15, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3