+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 48
- Action: Signed
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:54 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 26, 2008: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 14, 2008: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 4
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor