+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 12
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:06 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- House first read
+ − Amendment
2-24 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2011: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 18, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor