+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:09PM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH
- SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH to Bill - Carter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 10:41AM.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 28, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 17, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor