+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Barto flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:45PM.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2017: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
April 24, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 16, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 23, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 23, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor