+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
January 11, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 11, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor