+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 15, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 15, 2009: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor