+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
- Rules
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to MAPS - Harper
- Amendment: Floor Amend to MAPS - Gallego - passed as divided page 1 lines 1 & 2, line 3 constitution (remainder of Amendment failed)
- Amendment withdrawn: APPROP
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment; reference to the Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Gallego Floor Amendment; reference to the Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Gallego Floor Amendment; reference to the Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 17, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
January 18, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
January 18, 2011: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1