+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by JUD - Pratt - passed as amended
- Floor Amend to JUD - Roberts - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:45PM.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
February 18, 2021: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 14, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8