+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 4, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 179
- Action: Signed
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Waring flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: CMMA
- Amendment: Bill failed originally by s/v 26-27 requiring a roll call vote.
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-9 fin-ced
Senate Fact Sheet
4-19 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
April 19, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2007: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 10, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor