+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by JUD - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
April 7, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2021: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 18, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 14, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8