+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 173 e
- Action: Signed
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pmobject
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Senate second read
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:15 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 11, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Burns flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Burns flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-16 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 21, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 23, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 11, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor