+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 11
January 14, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 14, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 11