+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Criminal Justice Reform Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Criminal Justice Reform Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 3, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
January 14, 2021: House Criminal Justice Reform Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 14, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7