+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Amended by GE - passed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
February 21, 2022: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 17, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 18, 2022: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 12
January 18, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor