+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 76
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-22 jud_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-18 jud_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2011: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor