+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- NREW (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass amended.
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 13, 2024 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 8, 2024 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 24, 2024: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
April 10, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
March 4, 2024: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2024: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 8, 2024: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 8, 2024: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor