+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 233 e
- Action: Signed
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On May 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:51 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McClure
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:15 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Institutions and Retirement
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
McClure Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McClure Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-3 fiir
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
May 19, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 19, 2008: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2008: Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor