+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Failed to pass
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate first read
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: FSR - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to FSR - Thorpe #1
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to FSR - Thorpe #2
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Federalism and States' Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Floor Amend to FSR - Thorpe #2 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to FSR - Thorpe #1 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2015: Government: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
March 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2015: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor