+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:39PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 25, 2019: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2019: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor