+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment: PIR - W/D
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass amended
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Institutions and Retirement
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Public Institutions and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-24 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Institutions and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2008: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 16, 2008: Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor