+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:38PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Diaz - passed
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 28, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
March 6, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 26
January 18, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 18, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3