+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 10, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Without Signature
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
- Gowan flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Cobb - passed
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Amended by JUD - Pratt - withdrawn
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (7)
June 30, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
June 29, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
March 2, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
January 12, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 12, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 12, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor