+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- House Local and International Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Local and International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 30, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
January 9, 2017: House Local and International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 9, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor