+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
- Senator Mesnard motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass HB 2049 on Third Reading on May 24, 2021. Motion carried.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:17PM.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 18, 2021: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 24
January 12, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 12, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor