+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On May 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:54 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Biggs
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-14 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
Biggs Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 14, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor