+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 43
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 3, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor