+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 93
- Action: Signed
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: TRANS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate second read
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-21 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Gould Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-7 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
4-17 aspassedsenate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
April 15, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 14, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor