+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
January 15, 2013: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 15, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor