+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- BI - passed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass amended.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 9, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 9, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor