+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Finchem - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Finchem - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Financial Institutions: Failed to pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
January 11, 2016: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 11, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2016: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 11, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2