+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Mesnard flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to WM - Petersen - passed
- WM - passed as amended
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
March 26, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
February 25, 2019: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
January 22, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2019: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor