+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 8:32AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 16, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 10, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 10, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor