+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (10)
May 6, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Senate Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 11, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 11, 2016: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 11, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2016: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1