+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Senate Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- ELECT - passed
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Elections Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 12, 2019: House Elections Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor