+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (6)
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
January 12, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 12, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 12, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 12, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor