+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- At the request of the House, House Bill 2027 was returned to the House of Representatives for the purpose of reconsideration.: PASSED
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Request the bill be returned from the senate and then reconsidered
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:45PM.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 18, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
January 11, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 11, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor