+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: failed to pass.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- House Ways & Means Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
February 28, 2023: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
February 28, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
February 28, 2023: Senate Finance and Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2023: Senate Finance & Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
January 17, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2023: House Ways & Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor