+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Dial moved the portion of the Committee of the Whole report that HB 2024 do pass be amended to show the bill be retained on the calendar. Motion carried.
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- FSR - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Federalism and States' Rights - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 11, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 11, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 11, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 11, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor