+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:22PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- ELECT - passed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Elections Committee: do pass amended.
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2019: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 14, 2019: House Elections Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 14, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor