+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor