+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 41
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Kavanagh #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Kavanagh #1
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #1; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #2; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #2; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Kavanagh Floor Amendment #1; Reference to JUDICIARY Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 15, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 15, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor