+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 92 e
- Action: Signed
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref GOV)
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Senate second read
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-19gov
Senate Fact Sheet
3-26 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 15, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2008: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 14, 2008: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 14, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor