+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 11, 2022: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 11, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7